CT SB00102 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To expand the organizations that may certify mental health first aid training programs.
Title
An Act Concerning The Certification Of Mental Health First Aid Training Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 366 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 156 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 156 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Public Act 21-134 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Passed |
2021-05-14 | Senate | House Calendar Number 481 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-12 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-04-13 | Senate | File Number 418 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 258 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |