CT SB00098 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit any person from using a device to alter his or her name or telephone number on a caller identification display with the intent to defraud or cause harm and to prohibit telecommunications companies from charging customers for unauthorized services.
Title
An Act Concerning Criminal Impersonation By Means Of An Electronic Device.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 342 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Public Act 11-221 | |
2011-06-08 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-08 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-08 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-03 | House Calendar Number 583 | |
2011-06-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-06-02 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-02 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-02 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7603 | |
2011-04-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-27 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-27 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-26 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-21 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-08 | No New File by Committee on General Law | |
2011-04-08 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-07 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-07 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-01 | Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law | |
2011-03-01 | File Number 16 | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Calendar Number 41 | |
2011-03-01 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/28/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-02-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-02-15 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-01-28 | Public Hearing 02/03 | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology | |
2011-01-26 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-01-13 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |