CT SB00094 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To reduce newspaper public notice requirements for municipalities.
Title
An Act Concerning The Publication Of Municipal Legal Notices In Newspapers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Planning and Development |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |