CT SB00081 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To designate a portion of the Housatonic River as wild and scenic for purposes of designation and preservation under Section 2(a)(ii) of the federal Wild and Scenic Rivers Act.
Title
An Act Concerning The Designation Of Certain Areas Of The Housatonic River As A Wild And Scenic River.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 219 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 251 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 255 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 251 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 255 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Public Act 16-38 |
2016-05-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-02 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-02 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-01 | Senate | House Calendar Number 544 |
2016-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-29 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5104 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | File Number 30 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 75 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/16 5:00 PM |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |