CT SB00071 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize certain on-line boating and hunting safety courses.
Title
An Act Concerning Certain Revisions To The Mattress Stewardship Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 302 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 370 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 370 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Public Act 14-170 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Calendar Number 542 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5590 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Matter Pass Retained |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-18 | Senate | File Number 34 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 59 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |