CT SB00069 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - House Calendar Number 577
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - House Calendar Number 577
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To exempt veterinarians from the electronic prescription drug monitoring program.
Title
An Act Exempting Veterinarians From The Electronic Prescription Drug Monitoring Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 302 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 306 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 306 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | House Calendar Number 577 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5883 |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Matter Pass Retained |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-23 | Senate | File Number 156 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 157 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on General Law |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on General Law |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference General Law |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/16 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |