CT SB00066 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To maintain certain requirements concerning the installation and use of outdoor wood-burning furnaces, in light of expected federal rules on outdoor wood-burning furnaces, and to require owners of all outdoor wood-burning furnaces to burn only wood that is not chemically treated.
Title
An Act Concerning Outdoor Wood-burning Furnaces.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Sen. Paul Doyle [D] | Sen. Kevin Witkos [R] | Sen. Tony Hwang [R] |
Sen. Edward Meyer [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] | Sen. Stephen Cassano [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 302 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 70 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 70 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Public Act 14-92 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Passed |
2014-04-10 | Senate | House Calendar Number 314 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | File Number 31 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 56 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |