CT SB00060 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 439
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require individuals openly carrying to produce their permit if their firearm is visible and if requested by a law enforcement officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Presentation Of A Carry Permit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateFile Number 439
2019-04-04SenateSenate Calendar Number 215
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-04SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-21SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-04SenatePublic Hearing 03/11
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-21SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-01SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback