CT SB00059 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-28 - Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-28 - Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide adult adopted persons, twenty-one years of age or older whose adoptions were finalized on or after July 1, 2014 with access to their birth parents' health information and information in the person's original birth certificate or record.
Title
An Act Concerning Access To Birth Certificates By Adopted Persons.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Sen. Edward Meyer [D] | Rep. David Alexander [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Bye [D] |
Rep. James Albis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |