CT SB00045 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the annual expenditure on the Learn Here, Live Here program to not more than five million dollars and to make such program available only to individuals whose income is fifty-five thousand dollars or less.
Title
An Act Concerning The Learn Here, Live Here Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-05 | Senate | File Number 306 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 225 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |