CT SB00024 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-13 - Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-13 - Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To add new members to the interagency council on affordable housing.
Title
An Act Concerning The Membership Of The Interagency Council On Affordable Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Change of Reference Housing |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |