CT SB00022 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-14 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-14 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning Small Business Assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-04-08 | File Number 383 | |
2010-04-08 | Senate Calendar Number 246 | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-08 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-01 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-23 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-23 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-12 | Public Hearing 03/16 | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |