CT SB00021 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Public Hearing 03/03
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Public Hearing 03/03
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To create jobs in the gaming industry and increase revenue to the state.
Title
An Act Authorizing Sports Wagering, Internet Gaming, A Casino Gaming Facility In Bridgeport, Entertainment Zone Facilities, Internet Lottery And Internet Keno.
Sponsors
House Public Safety and Security Committee | Sen. Catherine Osten [D] | Rep. Christine Conley [D] | Sen. Eric Berthel [R] |
Sen. Paul Formica [R] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |