CT SB00021 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require individual and group health insurance coverage of routine patient costs associated with clinical trials for the treatment of disabling, progressive or life-threatening medical conditions.
Title
An Act Concerning Health Insurance Coverage For Routine Patient Care Costs For Certain Clinical Trial Patients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 336 AS AMENDED (Y: 94 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 307 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 306 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 6727 (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 307 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 306 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 6727 (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Public Act 11-172 | |
2011-06-08 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-08 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-01 | House Calendar Number 571 | |
2011-06-01 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-31 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-31 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6727 | |
2011-05-16 | File Number 801 | |
2011-05-16 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-16 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-05-16 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-09 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/16/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-05-05 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-04 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-04-27 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-01 | File Number 15 | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Calendar Number 45 | |
2011-03-01 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/28/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-02-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-02-10 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-01-28 | Public Hearing 02/03 | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |
2011-01-18 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-01-14 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-01-05 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |