CT SB00018 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-24 - House Calendar Number 470
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-24 - House Calendar Number 470
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To create a task force to address the issues concerning hoarding.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study Hoarding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 115 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | Senate | House Calendar Number 470 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6374 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | File Number 328 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 239 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Change of Reference Public Safety and Security |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |