CT SB00016 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit unauthorized pelvic examinations on female patients who have been administered deep sedation or anesthesia or are unconscious.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Prohibiting An Unauthorized Pelvic Examination On A Female Patient Who Is Under Deep Sedation Or Anesthesia Or Unconscious.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health
2019-02-26SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-13SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-31SenatePublic Hearing 02/04
2019-01-18SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-11SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback