CT SB00011 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Public Hearing 03/22
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To provide for and regulate the retail sale of marijuana to persons twenty-one years of age or older and taxation of any sales of such marijuana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Legalization And Taxation Of The Retail Sale Of Marijuana.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17SenatePublic Hearing 03/22
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-15SenateDrafted by Committee
2017-02-15SenateVote to Draft
2017-01-04SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback