CT SB00008 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-26 - House Calendar Number 597
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-26 - House Calendar Number 597
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) extend the debt-free community college program to returning students, (2) increase the amount of minimum grants under the debt-free community college program, (3) reallocate ARPA funds under the Roberta B. Willis Scholarship program to the Connecticut State University System, (4) require the Connecticut Higher Education Supplemental Loan Authority to establish a Student Loan Subsidy Program to reduce the interest rate on authority loans to individuals employed in certain high-demand professions, and (5) provide a tax deduction to residents of the state who paid interest on student loans during the taxable year.
Title
An Act Concerning Higher Education Affordability And Graduate Retention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 261 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 44 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 44 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | House | House Calendar Number 597 |
2023-05-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-25 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8705 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-09 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-21 | Senate | File Number 139 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 104 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |