CT SB00005 | 2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Public Hearing 02/27
Pending: Joint Energy and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require Internet service providers to register and pay registration fees and to require the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority to apply net neutrality principles to Internet service providers and enforce such principles with civil penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Internet Service Providers And Net Neutrality Principles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21SenatePublic Hearing 02/27
2020-02-20SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
2020-02-19SenateDrafted by Committee
2020-02-11SenateVote to Draft
2020-02-05SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback