CT SB00004 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Office of Higher Education to study issues relating to higher education in the state.
Title
An Act Assisting Students Without Legal Immigration Status With The Cost Of College.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 76 SENATE AMD A (Y: 90 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 77 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 73 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 78 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 36 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 79 HOUSE AMD C (Y: 60 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 80 HOUSE AMD D (Y: 63 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 81 HOUSE AMD E (Y: 73 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 82 AS AMENDED (Y: 91 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 56 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 3794 (Y: 6 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 57 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 58 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 3794 (Y: 6 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 59 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 77 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 73 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 78 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 36 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 79 HOUSE AMD C (Y: 60 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 80 HOUSE AMD D (Y: 63 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 81 HOUSE AMD E (Y: 73 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 82 AS AMENDED (Y: 91 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 56 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 3794 (Y: 6 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 57 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 58 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 3794 (Y: 6 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 59 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Public Act 18-2 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor |
2018-04-25 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-04-25 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-04-25 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule E 4267 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule D 4212 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 4252 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 4178 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 4169 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-04-19 | Senate | House Calendar Number 405 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 3794 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3808 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | File Number 206 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 144 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/13 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |