CT SB00002 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - File Number 517
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - File Number 517
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a more equitable education cost-sharing grant formula.
Title
An Act Concerning The Development Of A More Equitable Education Cost-sharing Grant Formula.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | File Number 517 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 273 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |