CT SB00002 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority to study the disclosure of electric supplier contract terms on electric customer bills and the feasibility to redesigning the web site on which an information summary on electric suppliers is posted.
Title
An Act Concerning Electric Customer Consumer Protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 244 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 218 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 206 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 4603 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 218 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 206 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 4603 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Public Act 14-75 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-05 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 5071 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-01 | Senate | House Calendar Number 481 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-29 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 4603 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4550 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | File Number 639 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-21 | Senate | New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/14 10:00 AM |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-04-02 | Senate | File Number 264 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 192 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |