CT SB00002 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require nursing homes to have air conditioning in each resident's room.
Title
An Act Concerning Air Conditioning In Nursing Homes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-24 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-17 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | |
2011-03-09 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | |
2011-03-09 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | |
2011-03-08 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-07 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-07 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Human Services | |
2011-03-02 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-03-02 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-03-02 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-01 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-01 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Health | |
2011-02-17 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging | |
2011-02-15 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-01-11 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-01-05 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |