CT SB00001 | 2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To: (1) Expand required health insurance coverage for prescription drugs, equipment and supplies used to treat diabetes; (2) restrict cost-sharing for such drugs, equipment and supplies; (3) require licensed pharmacists to dispense such drugs, equipment and supplies without a prescription in certain circumstances; (4) require the Commissioner of Social Services to study and report regarding the feasibility of implementing a low-income diabetes assistance fund; and (5) make changes to various provisions of the general statutes concerning high deductible health plans to more closely conform to provisions of the Internal Revenue Code concerning health savings accounts and medical savings accounts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Diabetes And High Deductible Health Plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2020-03-03SenateJoint Favorable
2020-02-21SenatePublic Hearing 02/25
2020-02-19SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
2020-02-18SenateDrafted by Committee
2020-02-13SenateVote to Draft
2020-02-05SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback