CT HR00009 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-25 - Adopted, House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-25 - Adopted, House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Proposing Approval Of A Collective Bargaining Agreement Between The State Of Connecticut And The Connecticut State Police Union (np-1 Bargaining Unit).
Title
Resolution Proposing Approval Of A Collective Bargaining Agreement Between The State Of Connecticut And The Connecticut State Police Union (np-1 Bargaining Unit).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 5 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (House) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (House) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-25 | House | Adopted, House |
2023-01-19 | House | File Number 2 |
2023-01-19 | House | House Calendar Number 11 |
2023-01-19 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-01-19 | House | Favorable Report, House Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-01-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 01/24/23 5:00 PM |
2023-01-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-01-18 | House | House Favorable |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing 01/18 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-09 | House | Filed with House Clerks 01/04 |