CT HJ00214 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Decision Of The Office Of The Claims Commissioner To Deny Certain Claims.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Decision Of The Office Of The Claims Commissioner To Deny Certain Claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 398 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 185 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 185 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2021-06-07 | House | Adopted, Senate as Amended by House A |
2021-06-07 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-26 | House | File Number 736 |
2021-05-26 | House | Senate Calendar Number 486 |
2021-05-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-24 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Adopted, House as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-24 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9107 |
2021-04-22 | House | File Number 588 |
2021-04-22 | House | House Calendar Number 415 |
2021-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/21/21 5:00 PM |
2021-04-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-08 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/26 |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |