CT HJ00164 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Michael E. Pohl Of Manchester To Be A Member Of The Board Of Pardons And Paroles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Michael E. Pohl Of Manchester To Be A Member Of The Board Of Pardons And Paroles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 89 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 67 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-05-08SenateAdopted, Senate
2019-05-08SenateRules Suspended
2019-05-08SenateSenate Calendar Number 465
2019-05-08SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-08SenateRules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate
2019-05-07HouseAdopted, House
2019-05-02HouseHouse Calendar Number 535
2019-05-02HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-02HousePublic Hearing 04/30

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback