CT HJ00080 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Vacating The Decision Of The Claims Commissioner To Deny The Claim Against The State Of Zwinda Soto, Ppa Jesus Rivera.
Title
Resolution Vacating The Decision Of The Claims Commissioner To Deny The Claim Against The State Of Zwinda Soto, Ppa Jesus Rivera.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 233 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 53 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 53 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 455 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2023-05-04 | House | Adopted, House |
2023-04-18 | House | File Number 657 |
2023-04-18 | House | House Calendar Number 425 |
2023-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-31 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-31 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-13 | House | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |