CT HB06455 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - File Number 471
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - File Number 471
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To clarify and enhance penalties associated with impeding or obstructing the work of the General Assembly and interference with or assault upon a State Capitol Police officer.
Title
An Act Concerning Impeding Or Obstructing The General Assembly And Interference With Or Assault Upon A State Capitol Police Officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | File Number 471 |
2021-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 340 |
2021-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |