CT HB07601 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on January 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-31 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-31 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Concerning Adjustments To The State Budget Regarding The Medicare Savings Program And Eligibility Therefor.
Title
An Act Concerning Adjustments To The State Budget Regarding The Medicare Savings Program And Eligibility Therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Aresimowicz [D] | Rep. Matthew Ritter [D] | Rep. Themis Klarides [R] | Rep. Vincent Candelora [R] |
Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Sen. Robert Duff [D] | Sen. Leonard Fasano [R] | Sen. Kevin Witkos [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-31 - House - House Roll Call Vote 420 REPASSAGE (Y: 126 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 472 REPASS (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 419 EMERGENCY CERTIFI (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-01-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 471 PASS EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 472 REPASS (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 419 EMERGENCY CERTIFI (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-01-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 471 PASS EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | In Concurrence |
2018-01-31 | House | Senate Reconsidered, Veto Overruled |
2018-01-31 | House | Senate Reconsidered |
2018-01-31 | House | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Veto Overruled, House |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Public Act 17-1 |
2018-01-08 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2018-01-08 | House | House Passed |
2018-01-03 | House | Emergency Certification |