CT HB07501 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - NO ACTION TAKEN BY THE HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Concerning The State Budget For The Biennium Ending June 30, 2019, Appropriations And Implementing Provisions Therefor And Authorizing And Adjusting Bonds Of The State For Various Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The State Budget For The Biennium Ending June 30, 2019, Appropriations And Implementing Provisions Therefor And Authorizing And Adjusting Bonds Of The State For Various Purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 405 EMERGENCY CERTIFI SENATE AMD B (Y: 78 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-09-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 406 EMERGENCY CERTIFI HOUSE AMD A (Y: 74 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-09-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 407 EMERGENCY CERTIFI HOUSE AMD B (Y: 74 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-09-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 408 EMERGENCY CERTIFI HOUSE AMD C (Y: 74 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-09-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 409 EMERGENCY CERTIFI HOUSE AMD D (Y: 73 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-09-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 410 EMERGENCY CERTIFI HOUSE AMD E (Y: 74 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-09-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 411 EMERGENCY CERTIFI HOUSE AMD F (Y: 74 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-09-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 412 AS AMENDED (Y: 77 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 466 PASS SENATE AMD B LCO 10072 (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 467 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A,B (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-03HouseNO ACTION TAKEN BY THE HOUSE
2017-09-28HouseVetoed by the Governor
2017-09-27HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2017-09-27HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2017-09-26HousePublic Act 17-1
2017-09-15HouseIn Concurrence
2017-09-15HouseHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
2017-09-15HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule F 10120
2017-09-15HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule E 10122
2017-09-15HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule D 10116
2017-09-15HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 10118
2017-09-15HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 10107
2017-09-15HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 10108
2017-09-15HouseHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
2017-09-15HouseHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2017-09-15HouseSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
2017-09-15HouseSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 10072
2017-09-15HouseSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10069
2017-09-15HouseTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2017-09-14HouseEmergency Certification

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB07501&which_year=2017
Texthttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/TOB/h/2017HB-07501-R00-HB.htm
Texthttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/ACT/pa/2017PA-00001-R00HB-07501SS1-PA.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/VOTE/h/2017HV-00412-R00HB07501-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/VOTE/h/2017HV-00411-R00HB07501-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/VOTE/h/2017HV-00410-R00HB07501-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/VOTE/h/2017HV-00409-R00HB07501-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/VOTE/h/2017HV-00408-R00HB07501-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/VOTE/h/2017HV-00407-R00HB07501-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/VOTE/h/2017HV-00406-R00HB07501-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/VOTE/h/2017HV-00405-R00HB07501-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/VOTE/s/2017SV-00467-R00HB07501-SV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/VOTE/s/2017SV-00466-R00HB07501-SV.htm

Bill Comments

feedback