CT HB07424 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Concerning The State Budget For The Biennium Ending June 30, 2021, And Making Appropriations Therefor, And Provisions Related To Revenue And Other Items To Implement The State Budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The State Budget For The Biennium Ending June 30, 2021, And Making Appropriations Therefor, And Provisions Related To Revenue And Other Items To Implement The State Budget.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 309 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 10782 (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 310 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 10866 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 311 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 10679 (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 312 ADOPT SENATE AMD D LCO 10664 (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 313 ADOPT SENATE AMD E LCO 10677 (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 314 ADOPT SENATE AMD F LCO 10670 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 315 PASS (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 274 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 126 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 275 HOUSE AMD C (Y: 60 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 276 HOUSE AMD D (Y: 60 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 277 HOUSE AMD E (Y: 60 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 278 HOUSE AMD F (Y: 60 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 279 HOUSE AMD G (Y: 60 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 280 HOUSE AMD H (Y: 59 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 281 HOUSE AMD I (Y: 60 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 282 HOUSE AMD J (Y: 60 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 283 HOUSE AMD K (Y: 60 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 284 AS AMENDED (Y: 86 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-20SenatePublic Act 19-117
2019-06-04SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-04SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
2019-06-04SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule F 10670
2019-06-04SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 10677
2019-06-04SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 10664
2019-06-04SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 10679
2019-06-04SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 10866
2019-06-04SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 10782
2019-06-04SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
2019-06-03SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-03HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
2019-06-03HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule K 10657
2019-06-03HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule J 10633
2019-06-03HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule I 10637
2019-06-03HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule H 10652
2019-06-03HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule G 10644
2019-06-03HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule F 10635
2019-06-03HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule E 10636
2019-06-03HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule D 10639
2019-06-03HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 10647
2019-06-03HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 10618
2019-06-03HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10581
2019-06-02HouseEmergency Certification

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB07424&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-07424-R00-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00117-R00HB-07424-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00284-R00HB07424-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00283-R00HB07424-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00282-R00HB07424-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00281-R00HB07424-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00280-R00HB07424-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00279-R00HB07424-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00278-R00HB07424-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00277-R00HB07424-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00276-R00HB07424-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00275-R00HB07424-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00274-R00HB07424-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00315-R00HB07424-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00314-R00HB07424-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00313-R00HB07424-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00312-R00HB07424-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00311-R00HB07424-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00310-R00HB07424-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00309-R00HB07424-SV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback