CT HB07373 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Department of Revenue Services' recommendations for minor revisions to the tax and related statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Revenue Services' Recommendations For Tax Administration And Minor Revisions To The Tax And Related Statutes.
Sponsors
House Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee | Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R] | Sen. Paul Formica [R] | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 421 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 218 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 218 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-25 | House | Public Act 19-186 |
2019-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-30 | House | File Number 1016 |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Calendar Number 635 |
2019-05-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-28 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-28 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9423 |
2019-05-20 | House | File Number 914 |
2019-05-20 | House | House Calendar Number 621 |
2019-05-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/20/19 10:00 AM |
2019-05-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-01 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-04-05 | House | Public Hearing 04/10 |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |