CT HB07361 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To make technical corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Adoption Of Master Plans By Tax Increment Districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 396 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 88 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-25HousePublic Act 19-185
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed
2019-05-10HouseSenate Calendar Number 480
2019-05-10HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-08HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-17HouseFile Number 702
2019-04-17HouseHouse Calendar Number 438
2019-04-17HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-01HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-14HousePublic Hearing 03/18
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback