CT HB07302 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To codify procedures concerning isolated confinement, provide for greater transparency concerning isolated confinement and provide training and wellness initiatives for correctional staff.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Isolated Confinement And Correctional Staff Training And Wellness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 389 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 345 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-11HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-06-29HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2017-06-29HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2017-06-26HousePublic Act 17-239
2017-06-07HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2017-06-07HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-07HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-06HouseSenate Calendar Number 600
2017-06-06HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2017-06-05HouseTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2017-06-05HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-05HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8685
2017-04-24HouseFile Number 693
2017-04-24HouseHouse Calendar Number 453
2017-04-24HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2017-04-24HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-04-17HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/17 10:00 AM
2017-04-06HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-04-04HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2017-03-23HousePublic Hearing 03/27
2017-03-22HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback