CT HB07295 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement minor revisions to the renters rebate program administered by the Office of Policy and Management.
Title
An Act Concerning Minor Revisions To The Renters Rebate Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 454 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 455 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 362 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 455 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 362 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-23 | House | Public Act 17-222 |
2017-06-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Passed |
2017-06-06 | House | Senate Calendar Number 612 |
2017-06-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-06-06 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2017-06-06 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2017-06-06 | House | House Passed |
2017-05-02 | House | File Number 713 |
2017-05-02 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-02 | House | New File by Committee on Housing |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/17 5:00 PM |
2017-04-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Housing |
2017-04-12 | House | File Number 559 |
2017-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 375 |
2017-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-17 | House | Public Hearing 03/22 |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |