CT HB07291 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require a law enforcement official to obtain a court order in order to conduct cellular telephone surveillance through use of a cell site simulator device.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Cell Site Simulator Devices By Law Enforcement Officials To Conduct Cellular Telephone Surveillance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 380 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 172 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 172 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-23 | House | Public Act 17-221 |
2017-06-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Passed |
2017-05-19 | House | Senate Calendar Number 483 |
2017-05-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-17 | House | House Passed |
2017-04-25 | House | File Number 705 |
2017-04-25 | House | House Calendar Number 461 |
2017-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/17 5:00 PM |
2017-04-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-07 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-23 | House | Public Hearing 03/27 |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |