CT HB07276 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To provide state education mandate relief by making implementation of the uniform regional school calendar optional, eliminating the requirement that an alternative educational opportunity for expelled students shall be nine hundred hours, require the Department of Education to purchase a digital school management and reporting software, require only certain school employees who have direct contact with students to complete training in the restraint and seclusion of students, require school districts to contact only those former employers in which an applicant was employed for any of the previous twenty years, eliminate the requirement that an administrator attend every planning and placement team meeting, and eliminate the superintendent requirement for certain boards of education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Education Mandate Relief.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 441 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 267 AS AMENDED (Y: 126 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-11SenateSigned by the Governor
2017-06-29SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2017-06-29SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2017-06-23SenatePublic Act 17-220
2017-06-07SenateOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2017-06-07SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-07SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2017-05-31SenateFile Number 818
2017-05-31SenateSenate Calendar Number 554
2017-05-31SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2017-05-30SenateImmediate Transmittal to the Senate
2017-05-30HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-05-30HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7761
2017-04-11HouseFile Number 512
2017-04-11HouseHouse Calendar Number 352
2017-04-11HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2017-04-11HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-04-05HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM
2017-03-27HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-24HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2017-03-15HousePublic Hearing 03/20
2017-03-14HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback