CT HB07272 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Senate Calendar Number 509
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To affirmatively set forth that a person's authority to make decisions concerning the disposition of a decedent's body under section 45a-318 of the general statutes does not permit one to authorize the posthumous retrieval of sperm or eggs from the decedent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Disposition Of A Decedent's Body.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 106 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseSenate Calendar Number 509
2019-05-16HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-14HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-30HouseFile Number 846
2019-04-30HouseHouse Calendar Number 529
2019-04-30HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-30HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-23HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-12HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-12HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-04-12HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-14HousePublic Hearing 03/18
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback