CT HB07248 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To amend the state code of ethics for public officials to modify when the state will pay attorney fees to the respondent for certain complaints under the code, to apply the open and public process requirements to certain quasi-public agency contracts and to extend certain prohibitions to consultants and independent contractors hired by quasi-public agencies and the employees of such consultants and contractors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Appointments To The Citizen's Ethics Advisory Board And The Board's Authority In Ethics Enforcement Proceedings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 448 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 449 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 338 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-11HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-06-29HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2017-06-29HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2017-06-26HousePublic Act 17-235
2017-06-07HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2017-06-07HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-07HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-05HouseSenate Calendar Number 596
2017-06-05HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2017-06-05HouseTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2017-06-05HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-05HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8552
2017-04-26HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2017-04-26HouseNo New File by Committee on Judiciary
2017-04-26HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-04-26HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-04-25HouseJoint Favorable
2017-04-19HouseReferred by House to Committee on Judiciary
2017-04-13HouseFile Number 596
2017-04-13HouseHouse Calendar Number 398
2017-04-13HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2017-04-13HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-04-07HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM
2017-03-28HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-24HouseJoint Favorable
2017-03-09HousePublic Hearing 03/13
2017-03-08HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback