CT HB07244 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To increase the property tax exemption amounts for veterans having a disability rating and require the filing of a death certificate with the town assessor to continue such exemption for a surviving spouse or minor children after the veteran's death.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Property Tax Exemption For Service Members And Veterans Having Disability Ratings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 420 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 195 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-25HousePublic Act 19-171
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-28HouseFile Number 1007
2019-05-28HouseSenate Calendar Number 626
2019-05-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-23HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-23HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8070
2019-04-19HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-19HouseNo New File by Committee on Planning and Development
2019-04-18HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-17HouseJoint Favorable
2019-04-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
2019-03-28HouseFile Number 200
2019-03-28HouseHouse Calendar Number 150
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-13HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/07
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback