CT HB07222 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - File Number 911
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - File Number 911
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To clarify the Attorney General's authority to (1) investigate allegations that an individual's civil rights are being violated, and (2) initiate legal proceedings in response to such allegations.
Title
An Act Concerning The Duties Of The Office Of The Attorney General.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - House - House Roll Call Vote 131 AS AMENDED (Y: 82 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | File Number 911 |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Calendar Number 523 |
2019-05-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-15 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-15 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8794 |
2019-04-29 | House | File Number 826 |
2019-04-29 | House | House Calendar Number 526 |
2019-04-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-08 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-11 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |