CT HB07190 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To extend good samaritan protections to persons or entities that include an opioid antagonist within a cabinet containing an automatic external defibrillator.
Title
An Act Extending Good Samaritan Protections For Persons Or Entities That Include An Opioid Antagonist Within A Cabinet Containing An Automatic External Defibrillator.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 402 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 137 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 137 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-25 | House | Public Act 19-169 |
2019-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Passed |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate Calendar Number 536 |
2019-05-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-16 | House | House Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | File Number 781 |
2019-04-25 | House | House Calendar Number 489 |
2019-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |