CT HB07177 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) require that (A) short-term rental properties be licensed by the Commissioner of Consumer Protection, (B) short-term rental operators notify owners of abutting and adjacent properties regarding use of a dwelling unit as a short-term rental property, and (C) short-term rental operators maintain minimum insurance coverage and the Insurance Commissioner adopt regulations concerning such coverage, (2) permit municipalities to tax short-term rental operators, and (3) subject short-term rental transactions to the sales and use tax.
Title
An Act Concerning Short-term Rental Properties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-02 | House | File Number 265 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 195 |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |