CT HB07171 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To expand the scope of practice of athletic trainers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Athletic Trainers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 429 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 139 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-10HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-06-26HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2017-06-26HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2017-06-20HousePublic Act 17-195
2017-06-07HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2017-06-07HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-07HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2017-05-12HouseFile Number 758
2017-05-12HouseSenate Calendar Number 454
2017-05-12HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2017-05-10HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-05-10HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6884
2017-04-12HouseFile Number 548
2017-04-12HouseHouse Calendar Number 363
2017-04-12HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2017-04-12HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-04-06HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/17 5:00 PM
2017-03-29HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-27HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2017-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/13
2017-02-23HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback