CT HB07141 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To require licensees under the banking statutes to supervise the operation of their business to ensure compliance with applicable law and to prohibit such licensees from engaging in fraudulent and deceptive acts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Secured And Unsecured Lending.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 461 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 462 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 289 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-11HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-06-29HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2017-06-29HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2017-06-26HousePublic Act 17-233
2017-06-07HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2017-06-07HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-07HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-02HouseSenate Calendar Number 576
2017-06-02HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2017-06-01HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-01HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8212
2017-03-23HouseFile Number 190
2017-03-23HouseHouse Calendar Number 159
2017-03-23HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2017-03-23HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-17HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/17 5:00 PM
2017-03-08HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-07HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2017-02-24HousePublic Hearing 03/02
2017-02-23HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Banking

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback