CT HB07127 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To adopt the Uniform Protected Series Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Uniform Protected Series Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-15HouseNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-15HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-29HouseFile Number 821
2019-04-29HouseHouse Calendar Number 523
2019-04-29HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-29HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-10HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-08HouseJoint Favorable
2019-02-15HousePublic Hearing 02/22
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback