CT HB07124 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 416
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require health insurance coverage for (1) a baseline mammogram for any woman who is thirty years of age or older, (2) an annual mammogram for any woman who receives a recommendation from such woman's treating physician and (A) is thirty years of age or older, (B) has a family history or prior personal history of breast cancer, or (C) has a prior personal history of breast disease diagnosed through biopsy as benign, and (3) comprehensive breast ultrasound screening for any woman who receives a recommendation from such woman's treating physician and (A) is thirty years of age or older, (B) has a family history or prior personal history of breast cancer, or (C) has a prior personal history of breast disease diagnosed through biopsy as benign.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Required Health Insurance Coverage For Mammograms And Breast Ultrasounds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 416
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 268
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-20HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-15HousePublic Hearing 02/21
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback