CT HB07124 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To require that pharmacy benefits managers disclose information regarding the maximum allowable cost of prescription drugs and establish procedures concerning maximum allowable cost lists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Health Insurance Coverage For Fertility Preservation For Insureds Diagnosed With Cancer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 289 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 245 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-20HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-06-08HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2017-06-08HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2017-06-07HousePublic Act 17-55
2017-06-02HouseIn Concurrence
2017-06-02HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-02HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2017-05-30HouseFile Number 808
2017-05-30HouseSenate Calendar Number 547
2017-05-30HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2017-05-25HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-05-25HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7854
2017-03-27HouseFile Number 230
2017-03-27HouseHouse Calendar Number 182
2017-03-27HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2017-03-27HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-20HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM
2017-03-10HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-09HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2017-02-24HousePublic Hearing 03/02
2017-02-22HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback