CT HB07103 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-20 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-20 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Concerning Excessive Use Of Force.
Title
An Act Concerning Excessive Use Of Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 370 EMERGENCY CERTIFI (Y: 107 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 481 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 481 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-20 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-07-10 | Senate | Public Act 15-4 |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Governor |
2015-06-29 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2015-06-29 | House | House Passed |
2015-06-27 | House | Emergency Certification |